THE YEAR OF REST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Year of Rest provides spaces of rest, retreat and hospitality to people struggling with burnout and stress due to financial hardship. We work to restore motivation, strategy and community so that people can overcome adversity through retreats, casework and mentoring.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 20 December 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Gray | Chair | 28 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Blacknell | Trustee | 28 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caragh Bennet | Trustee | 28 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Whittlesea | Trustee | 28 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND WITHIN THE CHRISTIAN ETHOS ARE: THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE BY PROVIDING SUCH PEOPLE WITH SUPPORT INCLUDING IN: (I) ADVICE AND ADVOCACY SERVICES; (II) PARTICIPATION IN RETREATS TO PROVIDE COACHING AND SUPPORT TO CREATING PERSONAL STRATEGIES TO MOVE OUT OF HARDSHIP AND DISADVANTAGE; (III) ACCESS TO COMMUNITY ACTIVITIES AND MENTORING TO BREAK THE SOCIAL ISOLATION WHICH IS A CONSEQUENCE OF HARDSHIP AND DISADVANTAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Apartment B201
134 Spa Road
LONDON
SE16 3AE
- Phone:
- 07592566331
- Email:
- theyearofrest@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window