Accounts and annual returns BOLTON UNDER FIVES FORUM

Charity Number: 519403
Charity reporting is up to date (41 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 March 2025 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 13 March 2025 41 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 February 2024 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 27 February 2024 27 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 March 2023 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 April 2023 76 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 March 2022 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 March 2022 56 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 April 2021 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 May 2021 107 days late Download Open in new window