BOLTON UNDER FIVES FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of education and welfare of children, including children with special educational needs and disabilities, in the Bolton area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bolton
- Lancashire
Governance
- 18 November 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Wareing | Trustee | 17 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANET SOUTHERN | Trustee |
|
||||||
LYNN STOKES | Trustee |
|
||||||
JANET HALTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.55k | £58.36k | £78.25k | £79.85k | £93.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.37k | £53.61k | £79.29k | £80.84k | £86.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.10k | £4.92k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 March 2025 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 March 2025 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 February 2024 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 February 2024 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 March 2023 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 April 2023 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 March 2022 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 March 2022 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 April 2021 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 May 2021 | 107 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/09/1987 AS AMENDED ON 05/10/2004 AS AMENDED ON 23/01/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND WELFARE OF ALL CHILDREN, INCLUDING THOSE WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS AND DISABILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
P B SYDDALL & CO
GRAFTON HOUSE
81 CHORLEY OLD ROAD
BOLTON
BL1 3AJ
- Phone:
- 01204380038
- Email:
- boltonunder5@tiscali.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window