THE PIEMAN PT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a mental health and wellbeing charity based in the North East of England with a focus on empowering adults aged 21 and above using the three peaks of Education, Exercise and Environment. Our charity was establised in memory of our brother, Lewis Boyd-Hill, whose warmth and wit will run through everything we do. We are developing our website which will contain more information on our aims.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 29 March 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexandra Elsdon Bocking Redhead | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frances Mary Boyd-Hill | Trustee | 17 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Kathleen Boyd-Hill | Trustee | 17 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.42k | £27.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.62k | £1.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 22 April 2025 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 22 April 2025 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 13 February 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | 13 February 2024 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO OFFER THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED (INCLUDING SERVICES RELATED TO ACTIVITIES AND SUPPORT AND RAISING AWARENESS THROUGH LOCAL PT STRUCTURES) OF PEOPLE WHO ARE EXPERIENCING OR AT RISK OF POOR MENTAL HEALTH OVER THE AGE OF 21 YEARS IN ENGLAND AND WALES IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, BUT INCLUDING BY: ? OFFERING INDIVIDUAL SUPPORT AND MENTORING, INCLUDING PERSONAL TRAINING, TO SUPPORT MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL HEALTH; ? PROVIDING ACCESS TO SPECIALIST MENTAL-HEALTH COUNSELLING; ? PROVIDING ACCESS TO COURSES, LECTURES, SEMINARS AND PRESENTATIONS TO SUPPORT THE CONTINUED DEVELOPMENT OF PEOPLE’S INDIVIDUAL CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCIES, SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING IN SUBJECTS RELATED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND GENERAL WELLBEING; ? FURTHERING PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF MENTAL HEALTH CONDITIONS, AND HOW TO MANAGE THEM IN OURSELVES AND OTHERS, SO AS TO ENHANCE PEOPLE’S ABILITY TO NAVIGATE THE COMPLEXITIES OF MODERN-DAY LIFE; ? TO PROVIDE ACCESS TO A VARYING RANGE OF EXPERIENCES AND OPPORTUNITIES TO PROMOTE INDIVIDUAL MENTAL RESILIENCE AND CONNECTION TO YOURSELF; AND ? TO DEVELOP A SHARED MINDSET AND CULTURE WHEREBY INDIVIDUALS APPRECIATE AND ENJOY LIFE IN ALL ITS FULLNESS; AND ? BY SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO MENTAL HEALTH AND TO DISSEMINATE ALL USEFUL RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 Marine Drive
The Headland
Hartlepool
TS24 0DY
- Phone:
- 07814417651
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window