REACH OUT FOR MENTAL HEALTH CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer free counselling sessions via trainee counsellors to adults living in Essex who are experiencing suicidal thoughts. This can be offered face to face, over the phone or via Zoom. We are currently offering befriending and coaching via volunteers but this may finish in 2023 due to a lack of volunteers. We offer peer support coffee afternoons, currently in Thurrock, Southend and Maldon.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Essex
- Southend-on-sea
- Thurrock
Governance
- 14 July 2022: CIO registration
- REACH OUT FOR MENTAL HEALTH (Working name)
- REACH OUT FOR MENTAL HEALTH CIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlie Patterson | Trustee | 18 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frederick William Hillinger | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thandekile Kawenga | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £155.32k | £149.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.29k | £141.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.40k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 22 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 22 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN NEED DUE TO SUFFERING FROM SUICIDAL TENDENCIES OR MENTAL ILLNESS, IN PARTICULAR IN ESSEX, THURROCK AND SOUTHEND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT BY FULLY TRAINED VOLUNTEERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Atholl House
65a Duke Street
Chelmsford
Essex
CM1 1HL
- Phone:
- 07898220384
- Email:
- info@reachoutfmh.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window