BISHOP'S STORTFORD AND SAWBRIDGEWORTH STREET PASTORS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are fully trained volunteers from local churches in Bishops Stortford and Sawbridgeworth who care about our community. We visit the town centre , usually on Friday or Saturday nights, in teams of men and women, aiming to care for, listen to, and help people who are out and about in our town, especially those who are vulnerable or at risk of harm.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 15 June 2022: CIO registration
- 12 December 2023: Funds received from 1141439 BISHOP'S STORTFORD STREET PASTORS
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Gareth Tracey | Chair | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Bates | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard George Victor Townsend | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
CORINNE MARGARET LEWIS | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul McCafferty | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Ribeiro | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Anne McNeeney | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £2.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £6.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION ARE FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN THE GEOGRAPHIC AREA OF BISHOPS STORTFORD, SAWBRIDGEWORTH AND BEYOND AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHARITY LAW IN ENGLAND AND WALES, AS FOLLOWS: (1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STREET PASTOR LICENCE AGREEMENT WITH THE ASCENSION TRUST THROUGH: (I) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC PASTORAL CARE SERVICES TO HELP PEOPLE ON THE STREETS AND OTHER PUBLIC PLACES, GIVING GUIDANCE, SUPPORT AND SIGNPOSTING WHICH ASSIST IN PRESERVING PUBLIC ORDER, AVOID ANTI-SOCIAL BEHAVIOUR, RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE HEALTH AND BY (II) ENLIGHTENING OTHERS ABOUT CHRISTIANITY THROUGH RAISING AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF ECCLESIASTICAL RELEVANCE TO COMMUNITY AND PUBLIC LIFE, MOBILISING THE CHURCH ECUMENICALLY TO UNITY OF WORSHIP AND TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY CARRYING OUT THE MISSION AND OUTREACH WORK OF THE GOSPEL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. (2) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED GROUPS IN OUR COMMUNITY IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH RAISING AWARENESS, PROMOTING, SUSTAINING AND INCREASING INDIVIDUAL AND COLLECTIVE KNOWLEDGE, SKILLS AND EXPERTISE, THROUGH THE PRACTICAL DEVELOPMENT OF INDIVIDUAL CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCES, SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING THROUGH FORMAL TRAINING, INFORMAL TALKS AND CAPACITY BUILDING IN VOLUNTARY SERVICES, ACCORDING TO CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND THE STREET PASTOR URBAN TRINITY PRINCIPLE OF CHURCH, POLICE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT WORKING TOGETHER FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY. 5 NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE. (TAKEN FROM STANDARD MODEL. CONNECTS TO SECTION ABOVE )
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Barnabas Centre
Church Lane
BISHOP'S STORTFORD
Hertfordshire
CM23 4BE
- Phone:
- 01279506753
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window