Trustees BRADFORD HINDU COUNCIL
Charity Number: 1199088

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ravinder Kumar Dharni | Chair | 17 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Reshma Patel | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maheshkumar Amratlal Mistry | Trustee | 19 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deepak Kumar Sharma | Trustee | 05 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Narendra Mistry | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dharmesh Mistry | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Harkishan Mistry | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jayaraj Shridhar Nambiar | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.