ENDEAVOUR MULTI ACADEMY TRUST CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our post 16 career development service supports young people aged 16 to 25 with special educational needs and disabilities to access employment, work experience and volunteer work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 20 May 2022: CIO registration
- 22 February 2023: Funds received from 1157585 WORK TO WORK
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Highfield | Chair | 20 May 2022 |
|
|||||
JILL BARTLETT | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eden Crane | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROGER BARTLETT | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.86k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £10.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 06 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY IN STAFFORDSHIRE AND THE WEST MIDLANDS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ACTIVITIES AND SERVICES OUTSIDE OF THE SCHOOL CURRICULUM; AND (B) SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH MAY BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
ENDEAVOUR MULTI ACADEMY TRUST
WIGHTWICK HALL SPECIAL SCHOOL
TINACRE HILL
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV6 8DA
- Phone:
- 01902761889
- Email:
- info@endeavourmat.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window