NORTH EAST IMMEDIATE CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit, the protection and preservation of human life and the relief of sickness for the public benefit within the geographical area served by the North East Ambulance Service by: i.providing and assisting in the provision of high quality pre-hospital medical treatment through a network of volunteer healthcare professional, ii.educating and training
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 11 October 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Natasha Tompkins | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Norton | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steven Miles | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HUMAN LIFE AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITHIN THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREA SERVED BY THE NORTH EAST AMBULANCE SERVICE BY: I. PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF HIGH QUALITY PRE-HOSPITAL MEDICAL TREATMENT THROUGH A NETWORK OF VOLUNTEER HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS, II. EDUCATING AND TRAINING MEDICAL PRACTITIONERS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN EMERGENCY AND PRE-HOSPITAL MEDICAL CARE
Area of benefit
THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREA SERVED BY THE NORTH EAST AMBULANCE SERVICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
North East Immediate Care
c/o Krolltek
Unit 3
Browns Yard
Brunswick Industrial Estate
Newcastl
- Phone:
- 07918359045
- Email:
- info@NEimmediatecare.org
- Website:
-
NEimmediatecare.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window