The Rusland Horizons Trust Limited

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote enhance improve protect and conserve the physical and natural environment and its natural beauty for the public benefit within a broad area centred on the Rusland valley and fells. To advance education and interest in the Landscape and natural environment and in the skills and knowledge associated with the conservation and improvement of the physical, natural and social environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £610 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
Governance
- 23 October 1987: Standard registration
- 20 January 2021: Funds received from 1060553 WOOD EDUCATION PROGRAMME TRUST
- NEW WOODMANSHIP TRUST (Working name)
- WOODMANSHIP LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Margaret Faulding | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|||||
David Weild | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Andrew Goldsmith | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Lee Richard Wright | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Andrew venables | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.19k | £17.74k | £24.11k | £23.90k | £17.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.25k | £11.94k | £18.14k | £28.59k | £21.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.96k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £200 | £400 | N/A | £610 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 November 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 November 2020 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 MAY 1987 as amended on 05 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN WOODLAND HISTORY, WOODLAND MANAGEMENT AND WOODLAND CRAFTS BY THE PROVISION OF A WOODMANSHIP CENTRE AND BY PRATICAL DEMONSTRATION IN THE FIEL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pipistrel House
Backbarrow
ULVERSTON
Cumbria
LA12 8QD
- Phone:
- 07399818801
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window