Community of the Cross of Nails (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pilgrimages and commemoration / remembrance services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 April 2022: CIO registration
- CCN (UK & IRELAND) (Working name)
- THE COMMUNITY OF THE CROSS OF NAILS (UK & IRELAND) (Previous name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Jonathan Cracknell Simmons | Chair | 25 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Cerys Jane Smith | Trustee | 03 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
REV SARAH BOURNE SWINTON HUNTER | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Mary Euphemia Taylor | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Viner | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2023 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 25 Apr 2022 as amended on 05 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY RESOURCING, ENABLING, EQUIPPING AND INSPIRING PEOPLE, ORGANISATIONS AND CHURCHES WITH A CHRISTIAN FAITH BASIS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, THE REPUBLIC OF IRELAND, FRANCE, BELGIUM, DENMARK, SWEDEN AND NORWAY TO LIVE WITH DIFFERENCE AND WORK TOWARDS A CULTURE OF PEACE, AS EXEMPLIFIED BY THE EXPERIENCE OF RE-BIRTH AND RENEWAL OF COVENTRY CATHEDRAL SINCE THE SECOND WORLD WAR, AND TO DO SO THROUGH ACTIVITIES SUCH AS INTER-COMMUNAL AND INTER-PERSONAL RECONCILIATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chapel House
Orleton
LUDLOW
SY8 4HN
- Phone:
- 07340340936
- Email:
- ccn.ukirl@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window