ASTLEY PARK SCHOOL PARENTS, STAFF AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Money raised provides additional facilities and support for pupils. For example, a new minibus; large outdoor play equipment; iPads; an outdoor classroom. They have also provided a defibrillator for use in the school in emergencies - school funds the training to use this equipment. The current project that the Charity is raising funds for, is a Sensory Room to be constructed within the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 27 October 1987: Standard registration
- ASTLEY PARK SCHOOL PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brett Austin Trevalyan | Chair | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kieran Welsh | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Wells | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Michelle Crouch | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.40k | £26.79k | £31.15k | £1.27k | £6.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.67k | £14.75k | £9.01k | £20.33k | £2.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 07 April 2021 | 281 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 OCTOBER 1987 AS AMENDED 22 SEPTEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ASTLEY PARK SCHOOL
HARRINGTON ROAD
CHORLEY
PR7 1JZ
- Phone:
- 01257262227
- Email:
- sbm@astleypark.lancs.sch.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window