CANCER SUPPORT DUDLEY METROPOLITAN BOROUGH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To help cancer patients their families and friends resident in the Metropolitan Borough of Dudley and surrounding areas through the trauma of the diagnosis and treatment of cancer by the provision of emotional support and practical help 2. To further the knowledge and understanding of cancer its treatment and its effects both to patients and families and friends, clinically and psychologically
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Dudley
Governance
- 27 October 1987: Standard registration
- 08 May 2012: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 08 May 2012: Funds transferred to 1141904 WHITE HOUSE CANCER SUPPORT LIMITED
- CANCER SUPPORT (Working name)
- CANCER SUPPORT DMB (Working name)
- CANCER SUPPORT DUDLEY (Working name)
- WHITE HOUSE CANCER SUPPORT (Working name)
- DUDLEY AND DISTRICT CANCER SUPPORT GROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £198.12k | £198.41k | £206.72k | £216.26k | £207.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £156.58k | £174.92k | £193.51k | £176.89k | £189.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 12 August 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 30 June 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 19 June 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 11 June 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 26 June 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 02 June 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 SEPTEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED 16 MAY 1989, 9 JUNE 1992, 8 JUNE 1993, 7 JUNE 1994, 3 APRIL 1995, 18 JUNE 1996, 30 JUNE 1997, 30 JUNE 2005 AND 26 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE CANCER PATIENTS, THEIR FAMILIES AND FRIENDS RESIDENT IN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF DUDLEY AND SURROUNDING AREAS, THROUGH THE TRAUMA OF THE DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF CANCER BY THE PROVISION OF CARE AND SUPPORT.(2) TO FURTHER THE KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF CANCER, ITS TREATMENT AND ITS EFFECTS, BOTH ON THE PATIENT, THEIR FAMILY AND FRIENDS, CLINICALLY AND PSYCHOLOGICALLY.
Area of benefit
METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF DUDLEY AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window