CATHEDRALS' WORKSHOP FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity raises funds to support craft training in cathedrals and provides specialist training in heritage craft skills to craftspeople working in cathedrals and the wider built heritage sector.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 August 2022: CIO registration
- THE CWF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carolyn Bruce | Chair | 17 November 2021 |
|
|||||||
Emily Charlotte MacKenzie | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|||||||
Edwin David Colthup | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|||||||
Matthew James Hall | Trustee | 09 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Jacqueline Ann Molnar | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Catherine Louise Escott | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Aug 2022 as amended on 26 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN STONEMASONRY AND OTHER CRAFT SKILLS, IN PARTICULAR IN RELATION TO THE CONSERVATION, MAINTENANCE AND PRESERVATION OF CATHEDRALS AND HISTORIC BUILDINGS; AND 3.1.2 ANCILLARY TO THE ABOVE, THE ADVANCEMENT OF CULTURE AND HERITAGE THROUGH THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND REPAIR OF CATHEDRAL AND HISTORIC BUILDINGS. (OBJECTS)
Contact information
- Address:
-
York Minster
Deangate
York
YO1 7HH
- Phone:
- 07932718119
- Email:
- info@cwfcathedrals.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window