ONE IMPOSSIBLE THING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide free recycled sports shoes, which we collect through donations from the community, to enable participation in sports and activities. We promote the benefits of recycling and reusing sports shoes. We raise awareness of the beneficial effect that participation in sports and exercise has on both mental and physical health. We currently operate in Herts and Beds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 10 February 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ray Gardiner | Chair | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nichola Drew | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paula Batten | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucia Jelley | Trustee | 04 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Hemmant-Low | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.99k | £19.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.25k | £4.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, BY THE PROVISION OF: (A) FREE RECYCLED SPORTS SHOES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SPORTS AND ACTIVITIES (B)PROMOTING THE BENEFITS OF RECYCLING AND REUSE OF SPORTS SHOES (C) RAISING AWARENESS OF THE BENEFICIAL EFFECT THAT PARTICIPATION IN SPORTS AND EXERCISE HAS ON BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 MOORLAND ROAD
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
HP1 1NQ
- Phone:
- 07958612866
- Email:
- contact@1impossiblething.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window