TARN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Delivering education and quality improvement in trauma care by supporting the work of the doctors, nurses and other professionals in evaluating the quality of care and performing research studies about major trauma.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
Governance
- 08 June 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Antoinette Edwards | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dhushyanthan Surendra Kumar | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROY MALCOLM DUDLEY-SOUTHERN | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Professor FIONA LECKY | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Professor Timothy John Coats | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 February 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 February 2024 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE ORGANISATION AND PRACTICE OF TRAUMA CARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT (BOTH NATIONALLY & INTERNATIONALLY) INCLUDING AUDIT, RESEARCH AND THE PUBLICATION OF RESULTS FROM SUCH ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Goatham Cottage
Goatham Lane
Osbaston
NUNEATON
Warwickshire
CV13 0DR
- Phone:
- 01612064397
- Email:
- admin@tarnfoundation.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window