THE GOLDERS GREEN ERUV

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is responsible for establishing and maintaining the Golders Green Eruv.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Provides Services
- Barnet
Governance
- 24 March 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW SELWYN COHEN | Chair | 24 March 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Benjamin Spiegel | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
AHARON DAVIS | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 November 2024 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 November 2024 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 November 2023 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 December 2023 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH, PARTICULARLY IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET AND IN PARTICULAR, BY PROMOTING SABBATH OBSERVANCE AMONGST ADHERENTS OF THAT FAITH BY: 1) THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF AN ERUV AND; 2) PROMOTION OF ORTHODOX JEWISH TEACHING CONCERNING OBSERVANCE OF THE SABBATH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 HIGHFIELD GARDENS
GOLDERS GREEN
LONDON
NW11 9HB
- Phone:
- 07836295833
- Email:
- NW11Eruv@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window