FRIENDS OF SURVIVORS AGAINST DOMESTIC ABUSE (SADA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of SADA is a charity that supports the work of Survivors Against Domestic Abuse. The team offer advice, support and housing to anyone who is suffering or has suffered from domestic abuse.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 20 May 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Muncey | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Francis John Ewan | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sean Prendergast | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.73k | £54.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £716 | £56.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 April 2024 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 April 2024 | 63 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING FACED BY WOMEN, MEN, CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED, OR ARE EXPERIENCING, DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AND ABUSE, IN ASSOCIATION WITH STATUTORY, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS, THIS RELIEF SHALL BE PROVIDED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF VOLUNTARY AND STATUTORY AGENCIES AND THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE, INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMIT, ITS CAUSES AND PREVENTION AND THE RELIEF OF ITS CONSEQUENCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stevenage Borough Council
Daneshill House
Danestrete
Stevenage
SG1 1HN
- Phone:
- 01438242666
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window