LEV ARIEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing volunteers and support to children in North West London when a parent is ill with cancer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
26 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Barnet
Governance
- 11 April 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Avigail Klein | Chair | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ahuva Meyer | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yael Chana Unsdorfer | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
MIGUEL GERARDO ABADI | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.25k | £6.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.69k | £16.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN WITH A PARENT SUFFERING FROM CANCER OR OTHER SIMILAR ILLNESSES IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF POSITIVE INDIVIDUAL AND/OR FAMILY EXPERIENCES, RESPITE CARE, OUTINGS, TREATS AND COMFORTS WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 GREEN WALK
LONDON
NW4 2AJ
- Phone:
- 02083719054
- Email:
- support@levariel.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window