THE COOMBE KEYNES TRUST 2022

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the restoration and permanent preservation for the public of the Church of the Holy Rood at Coombe Keynes in the county of Dorset, as a building of historical and architectural interest, which should be retained for the education of present and future generations; and to use the Church and any land appurtenant thereto for any public, social, educational or charitable purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 03 May 2022: CIO registration
- 27 January 2023: Funds received from 281073 THE COOMBE KEYNES TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Stuart | Chair | 28 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Michael Punch | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Hetreed | Trustee | 28 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETER CHARLES BRACHI | Trustee | 28 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Nicholas John Salt | Trustee | 28 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Philippa Punch | Trustee | 28 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Cotton | Trustee | 28 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jan Czeslaw Chadaj | Trustee | 28 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robin Stuart Bowler | Trustee | 28 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £6.82k | £10.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £7.34k | £8.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 March 2024 | 140 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 March 2024 | 140 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 May 2022 as amended on 15 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
(A) THE CIO IS ESTABLISHED TO PROMOTE THE RESTORATION AND PERMANENT PRESERVATION FOR THE PUBLIC OF THE CHURCH OF THE HOLY ROOD AT COOMBE KEYNES IN THE COUNTY OF DORSET (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CHURCH") AS A BUILDING OF HISTORICAL AND ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST WHICH SHOULD BE RETAINED FOR THE EDUCATION OF THE PRESENT AND FUTURE GENERATIONS; AND TO USE THE CHURCH AND ANY LAND APPURTENANT THERETO FOR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION (C) THE PROVISION, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, OF FACILITIES AVAILABLE TO MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE FACILITIES ARE PRIMARILY INTENDED: AND (D) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church of the Holyrood
Church Lane
Coombe Keynes
Wareham
Dorset
BH20 5PS
- Phone:
- 01929208227
- Email:
- trust_chair@coombekeynes.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window