BRECON & DISTRICT DIAL-A-RIDE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operates a door to door accessible transport service to disabled or elderly people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £52,066 from 2 government contract(s) and £26,091 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Powys
Governance
- 01 June 1989: Standard registration
- BRECON DIAL-A-RIDE (Working name)
- BRECON AND DISTRICT DISABLED CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara Anglezarke | Chair | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Robert Grant | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Lewis | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Smith | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Elizabeth Hill | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER ANTHONY JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206.10k | £165.78k | £216.54k | £221.09k | £224.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £199.49k | £153.11k | £190.99k | £221.75k | £265.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £51.22k | £43.17k | N/A | £41.80k | £52.07k | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.98k | N/A | £21.96k | £18.04k | £26.09k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION CONVERSION DATED 20 SEP 2022 as amended on 02 Feb 2023 as amended on 24 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH, WELLBEING, AND INDEPENDENCE OF PEOPLE WITH A DISABILITY OF ALL AGES (INCLUDING OLDER PEOPLE) TO ENABLE THEM TO LEAD NORMAL LIVES
Area of benefit
BRECON AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRECON & DISTRICT DIAL-A-RIDE CLUB
PLAS Y FFYNNON
Cambrian Way
Brecon
POWYS
LD3 7EH
- Phone:
- 01874624060
- Email:
- office@brecondialaride.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window