KING'S COLLEGE SCHOOL, CAMBRIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running a day/boarding school known as King's College School, Cambridge in accordance with the principles and doctrine of the Anglican faith but welcoming to pupils of all faiths or none; the provision of accommodation and education for School-age choristers of King's College, Cambridge; such other charitable purposes when they are not required for the formal education of the School's pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£9,155,618
Donations and legacies | £1.71m | |
Charitable activities | £7.32m | |
Other trading activities | £35.50k | |
Investments | £94.02k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£6,742,321
Raising funds | £3.35k | |
Charitable activities | £6.74m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.35k | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.74m | |
Retained for future use | £2.41m |
People

107 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 29 September 2022: Standard registration
- KING'S COLLEGE SCHOOL, CAMBRIDGE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE REVD CANON STEPHEN ARTHUR CHERRY BSC MA PHD | Chair | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
RICHARD DAVID HILL | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|||||||
Dr THOMAS KEITH CARNE | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|||||||
PROFESSOR JAMES WILLIAM FAWCETT | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Elisa Faraglia | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|||||||
JASON CHARLES JAMES | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
DANIEL STEPHEN HYDE | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
HENRY STUART THACKRAH | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
PETER ROBERT HASELDEN | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.16m | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.74m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.71m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £35.50k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £7.32m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £94.02k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.74m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.35k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £23.05k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £6.26m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £3.44m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £7.29m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 OCT 2021 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03 DEC 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 JUN 2022 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13 JUL 2022 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12 AUG 2022 as amended on 14 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY RUNNING A DAY AND/OR BOARDING SCHOOL KNOWN AS KING'S COLLEGE SCHOOL, CAMBRIDGE ('THE SCHOOL') IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND DOCTRINE OF THE ANGLICAN FAITH BUT WELCOMING TO PUPILS OF ALL FAITHS OR NONE; 2. THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION AND EDUCATION FOR SCHOOL-AGE CHORISTERS OF THE COLLEGE; 3. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN WHICH THE SCHOOL IS SITUATED AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY MAKING THE FACILITIES OF THE SCHOOL AND/OR OTHER PREMISES UNDER THE CONTROL OF THE CHARITY AVAILABLE FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHEN THEY ARE NOT REQUIRED FOR THE FORMAL EDUCATION OF PUPILS ATTENDING THE SCHOOL; AND 4. IN SO FAR AS IT IS INCIDENTAL OR ANCILLARY TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
KING'S COLLEGE SCHOOL
WEST ROAD
CAMBRIDGE
CB3 9DN
- Phone:
- 01223365814
- Email:
- office@kcs.cambs.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window