MEADOWCROFT FARM CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust has been set up to provide a vehicle for Dr Jaspal Sanghera and Mrs Shirly Sanghera to make personal charitable donations to a wide variety of organisations as one-off and regular payments. They provide the funds for the trust and they determine how and where donations are made. As administrator I make the donations on their behalf.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 March 2022: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Collins | Trustee | 04 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Shirley Sanghera | Trustee | 04 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jaspal Sanghera | Trustee | 04 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.00k | £5 | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.21k | £7.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 18 March 2025 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 18 March 2025 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 11 December 2024 | 310 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 18 March 2025 | 407 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY, ENGINEERING, MATHEMATICS AND MUSIC; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY; AND/OR (C) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 High Street
Orwell
ROYSTON
Hertfordshire
SG8 5QN
- Phone:
- 07770902001
- Email:
- mark@markcollins55.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window