NATIONWIDE ASSOCIATION OF BLOOD BIKES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To act as a representative body for blood bike groups whose aim is to assist the promotion of public health through voluntary support of hospital services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- NABB (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Chalmers | Chair | 23 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Byrne | Trustee | 23 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Johnathan Wootton | Trustee | 22 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Robert Aiden O'Leary | Trustee | 27 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
MELANIE ROWBOTTOM | Trustee | 26 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tyron Raymond Stevenson | Trustee | 27 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.15k | £40.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.62k | £12.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF BLOOD BIKE GROUPS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION BY: I) SUPPORTING THE BLOOD BIKE GROUPS IN PROVIDING A PROFESSIONAL, RAPID RESPONSE, MEDICAL TRANSPORT SERVICE TO THE NHS; II) PROMOTING THE ACTIVITIES OF BLOOD BIKE GROUPS TO THE NHS AND THE PUBLIC; III) PURSUING PARITY WITH OTHER FRONT LINE EMERGENCY SERVICES IN TERMS OF LEGISLATIVE SUPPORT AND NATIONAL RECOGNITION; IV) PROMOTING THE ADHERENCE BY BLOOD BIKE GROUPS TO STANDARDS SET BY HEALTH AND TRANSPORT REGULATORY BODIES AND RELEVANT LEGISLATION. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE OBJECT, A ?BLOOD BIKE GROUP? MEANS A CHARITY WHICH ADVANCES HEALTH BY PROVIDING A ?FREE AT POINT OF USE? COURIER SERVICE TO OR FROM NHS (OR EQUIVALENT) ESTABLISHMENTS FOR PRODUCTS DIRECTLY RELATED TO PATIENT WELFARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 BROCKLEY CLOSE
LITTLE STOKE
BRISTOL
BS34 6HA
- Phone:
- 07918603191
- Email:
- secretary@bloodbikes.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window