UWAKANEME COMMUNITY EDUCATION PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty in West Africa, in particular but not exclusively in Arochukwu, Nigeria, by providing funding to cover school fees and school items such as uniform and books for pupils in economically disadvantaged communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Nigeria
Governance
- 25 March 2022: CIO registration
- UCEP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Uwakaneme | Chair | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janice Horsman | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emmanuel Fatusin | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Westley | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Charles Nasmith Ogilvie | Trustee | 05 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Loren Jonathan Charlton | Trustee | 03 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Chikezie Okike | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Bianca Rosalie Hawkins | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.20k | £16.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.11k | £6.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN WEST AFRICA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN AROCHUKWU, NIGERIA, BY PROVIDING FUNDING TO COVER SCHOOL FEES AND SCHOOL ITEMS SUCH AS UNIFORM AND BOOKS FOR PUPILS IN ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
58 SANTOS WHARF
EASTBOURNE
EAST SUSSEX
BN23 5UR
- Phone:
- 07710530681
- Email:
- charles@blue-crest.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window