SIRI GURU SINGH SABHA CENTRAL CRAWLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
- Kent
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 23 February 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gurjiv Sekhon | Chair | 19 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Baljit Kang | Trustee | 13 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Avtar Singh-Bains | Trustee | 13 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harbir Padda | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Harpreet Singh Sandhar | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Balinder Singh Bhatia | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2023 | 28/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.72k | £20.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.10k | £22.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 30 October 2024 | 307 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 30 October 2024 | 307 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 23 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE SIKH RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF A PLACE OF WORSHIP, RAISING AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF RELIGIOUS BELIEFS AND PRACTICES, CARRYING OUT RELIGIOUS DEVOTIONAL ACTS AND CARRYING OUT OUTREACH WORK FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY ESPECIALLY THE ELDERLY AND THOSE IN NEED
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Mill Road
CRAWLEY
West Sussex
RH10 1ND
- Phone:
- 07957554787
- Email:
- crawleysgss@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window