THE PFC TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PFC Trust aims to improve the lives and life chances of local people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£697,189
Donations and legacies | £409.04k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £232.74k | |
Investments | £55.41k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£516,970
Raising funds | £204.94k | |
Charitable activities | £312.03k | |
Other | £0 |
£54,996 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £204.94k | |
Charitable expenditure | £312.03k | |
Retained for future use | £180.22k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £204.94k | |
Charitable expenditure | £312.03k | |
Retained for future use | £235.22k |
People

6 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Durham
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- Redcar And Cleveland
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 28 October 2022: CIO registration
- 10 October 2023: Funds received from 1187479 THE PFC TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shaun David Hope | Chair | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gary Riches | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Robert O'Sullivan | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Anne Elizabeth Beveridge | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
kelly daley | Trustee | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Connolly | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Frances Mary Connolly | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £697.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £516.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £409.04k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £232.74k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £55.41k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £312.03k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £204.94k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £312.03k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £5.61k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £806.98k | |
|
Other assets | £258.72k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £84.08k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 March 2025 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 March 2025 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 28 Oct 2022 as amended on 18 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO MAKE DONATIONS, GRANTS AND SCHOLARSHIPS AND PROVIDE SERVICES AND OPPORTUNITIES TO BENEFICIARIES (AS DEFINED IN CLAUSE 3.2) FOR THE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES SET OUT IN CLAUSE 3.3 (OBJECTS). 3.2 FOR THE PURPOSES OF CLAUSE 3.1, BENEFICIARIES ARE ORGANISATIONS OR INDIVIDUALS WHO RESIDE IN, OR CARRY OUT THEIR WORK WITHIN HARTLEPOOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. FOR THIS PURPOSE A BENEFICIARY RESIDES WHERE IT IS ORDINARILY RESIDENT (IN THE CASE OF AN INDIVIDUAL) OR (IN THE CASE OF AN ORGANISATION) WHERE ITS MAIN OFFICE IS LOCATED OR WHERE ITS PRINCIPAL ACTIVITY IS PERFORMED. 3.3 FOR THE PURPOSES OF CLAUSE 3.1, THE BENEFICIARIES' ACTIVITIES MUST BE CONFINED TO, OR THE PRIMARY PURPOSE OF THE FUNDING MUST BE TO FURTHER, ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES: 3.3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION - FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY THINKS FIT, INCLUDING: (A) THE AWARDING OF SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TO SUCH PERSONS TO ENABLE STUDY AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER EDUCATION. (B) PROVIDING THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS), TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION, OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. 3.3.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS - TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, CRAFTS AND CRAFTMANSHIP, PROVIDE ART GALLERIES, ART FESTIVALS AND ARTS HERITAGE COUNCILS. PROMOTE OR ENCOURAGE HIGH STANDARDS IN THE ARTS INCLUDING MUSIC, VISUAL ART SUCH AS PAINTING, DRAWING, SCULPTURE, PHOTOGRAPHY, THEATRE, DANCE, LITERATURE AND CINEMA. 3.3.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF AMATEUR SPORT - FOR THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF SPORTS. 3.3.4 THE ADVANCEMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT - TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES. 3.3.5 TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF THOSE WITH PHYSICAL, MENTAL, SENSORY IMPAIRMENT OR SICKNESS AND THOSE WHO CARE FOR THEM WITHIN THE FAMILY OR HOME BY OFFERING PROVISION FOR RESPITE SERVICE THROUGH PROVISION OF COMMUNITY-BASED CARE ATTENDANTS AND/OR HOLIDAYS FOR THOSE AFFECTED AND THEIR FAMILIES. 3.3.6 TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE: (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 3.3.7 TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS AND POOR HEALTH AMONGST ELDERLY PEOPLE BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES. 3.3.8 TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORK AND RECREATION. 3.3.9 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF HARTLEPOOL BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES. 3.3.10 ANY OTHER PURPOSES CURRENTLY RECOGNISED AS BEING CHARITABLE WITHIN THE SCOPE OF THE CHARITIES ACT, 2011. 3.4 NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The PFC Trust
Unit 3
110 Whitby Street South
HARTLEPOOL
Cleveland
TS24 7LP
- Phone:
- 07394638009
- Email:
- pfc.trust@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window