EVERY CAT MATTERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote humane behaviour and prevent cruelty and suffering towards cats in the UAE by providing appropriate care, protection, treatment and security for cats which are in need of care by reason of sickness, maltreatment, poor circumstance or ill usage, rehoming such cats, where possible, in the UAE or United Kingdom. Providing TNR service to stray cats and educating the public in animal welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- United Arab Emirates
Governance
- 01 November 2022: CIO registration
- ECM (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Freya Jayne Page | Chair | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Louise Cushman | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Mary Cavin | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
RUQAIA AL RUBAYE | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS CATS AND PREVENT CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG CATS IN THE UNITED ARAB EMIRATES BY: A) PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR CATS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE, REHOMING SUCH CATS, WHERE POSSIBLE, IN THE UNITED ARAB EMIRATES AND THE UNITED KINGDOM; B) PROVIDING TRAP NEUTER AND RELEASE SERVICES TO HOMELESS CATS, DESIGNED TO CONTROL THE POPULATION OF UNWANTED CATS; C) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO THE CARE AND WELFARE OF CATS.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
79 ARLINGTON DRIVE
CARSHALTON
SM5 2EU
- Phone:
- 07434633488
- Email:
- everycatmatters@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window