SKYWARD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Skyward provides immersive educational experiences and facilities centred around the aerospace industry. It takes its beneficiaries on a journey of discovery whilst providing immersive, educational, and emotive experiences and facilities. The charities content is curriculum rich and real world relevant, aiming to break down social and exclusivity barriers in the process.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 May 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD ADAM GRIFFIN | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Dawn Marianne Stokes | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Samuel Davies | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.27k | £93 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.27k | £93 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 May 2022
Charitable objects
I. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECTS OF SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY, ENGINEERING, MATHEMATICS AND IN THE FIELD OF AEROSPACE. II. TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN ENGLAND AND THE UK, BY ORGANISING EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND EXPERIENCES, AND BY PROMOTING CAREERS IN THE FIELD OF AEROSPACE AS A MEANS OF: ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/o 444 Bournemouth Airport
Aviation Business Park
Hurn
Christchurch
BH23 6NW
- Phone:
- 00000000000
- Email:
- enquiries@skyward.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window