SHIFT-ED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to empower young people by developing their imagination and creativity, fostering a foundation for innovative thinking and problem-solving. With a focus on real-world learning, we specialise in forming partnerships with artists, designers, and businesses within the creative sector to develop access to high-quality design and making experiences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 28 March 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexandra Gruber-Perez | Trustee | 22 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Charles Fish | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zek Hoeben | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Oliver Coombes | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Edwards Taylor | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Rose Sutton-Mattocks | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £200 | £46.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £33.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 IN LONDON AND THROUGHOUT THE UK, BY ORGANISING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PROJECT BASED LEARNING WITH A FOCUS ON THE ARTS, HUMANITIES AND SCIENCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
127 HIGHBURY HILL
LONDON
N5 1TA
- Phone:
- 07866518248
- Email:
- info@shifted.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window