GALHAMPTON VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To establish and run a village hall and playing field and to promote, for the benefit of the inhabitants of the village of Galhampton and the surrounding area, the provision of facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 01 April 2022: CIO registration
- 17 September 2024: Funds received from 277622 GALHAMPTON VILLAGE HALL & PLAYING FIELD
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Rickers | Chair | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Drew Thompson | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Davis | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jennifer Hamlin | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Geoffrey Trasler | Trustee | 16 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
TESSA RUTH CARTER | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Jane Williams | Trustee | 19 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Paul John Carter | Trustee | 18 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
FIONA HOOPER | Trustee | 13 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARION JUDITH FOX | Trustee | 01 January 2000 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.86k | £22.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.11k | £23.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF GALHAMPTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (“AREA OF BENEFIT”) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Galhampton Village Hall
Long Street
Galhampton
Yeovil
Somerset
BA22 7AY
- Phone:
- 07854 480212
- Email:
- village@galhampton.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window