Trustees GALHAMPTON VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD CIO

Charity Number: 1198488
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alan Rickers Chair 20 May 2019
None on record
Drew Thompson Trustee 20 October 2022
None on record
Kerry Davis Trustee 20 October 2022
None on record
Susan Jennifer Hamlin Trustee 20 October 2022
None on record
Brian Geoffrey Trasler Trustee 16 February 2021
None on record
TESSA RUTH CARTER Trustee 02 May 2017
None on record
Jennifer Jane Williams Trustee 19 May 2016
None on record
Paul John Carter Trustee 18 May 2015
None on record
FIONA HOOPER Trustee 13 January 2013
None on record
MARION JUDITH FOX Trustee 01 January 2000
None on record