THE JESSOP BABY FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 10 December 1987: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 OCTOBER 1987
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF SICKNESS IN NEWLY BORN OR RECENT BORN BABIES AND THEIR MOTHERS WITH POWER TO PAY FOR EQUIPMENT AMENITIES AND FACILITIES AT THE NEONATAL CARE UNIT AT JESSOP HOSPITAL FOR WOMEN, SHEFFIELD AND TO ADVANCE MEDICAL EDUCATION STUDY AND RESEARCH IN NEONATAL CARE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 1(A) TO (D).
Area of benefit
TRENT REGIONAL HEALTH AUTHORITY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window