MILITARY VS CANCER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a military founded, driven charity with extremely high standards. We provide grants to Military/Ministry of Defence personnel, past and present, including their immediate families who are suffering the effects of cancer. Military vs Cancer cannot stop cancer, we cannot control or alter its path but what we can do is step in and simplify the process to ease the pain of the families involved.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £6,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
300 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 May 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dominic Banner | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Barnes | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carri Nicholson | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Evans | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Moody | Trustee | 27 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Howarth | Trustee | 27 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £121.12k | £195.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.24k | £103.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 May 2022
Charitable objects
3.1) MILITARY VS CANCER AIMS TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO PERSONS IN NEED, BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH DUE TO THE EFFECTS OF CANCER THROUGHOUT THE BRITISH ISLES, BY ADVANCING ANY LAWFUL CHARITABLE PURPOSE AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY 3.1.1) TO MAKE GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS WHO DELIVER DIAGNOSIS, TREATMENT, CARE, RESEARCH, EDUCATION AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT TO PATIENTS AND FAMILIES DURING THE ONGOING STAGES OF THEIR CANCER JOURNEY; 3.1.2) TO PROVIDE OR MAKE AVAILABLE FACILITIES AND SERVICES FOR CANCER PATIENTS, THEIR FAMILIES AND FORMALLY APPOINTED CARERS; AND 3.1.3) ANY OTHER PROJECTS OR INITIATIVES WHICH THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Military vs Cancer,
Armstrong House,
First Avenue,
Finningley,
Doncaster
DN9 3GA
- Phone:
- 07469550679
- Email:
- INFO@MILITARYVSCANCER.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window