THE ORGANIC FAMILY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Organic Family Foundation supports their charity partners by providing financial support, supplying them with food donations, hosting events, and creating partnerships. Their efforts all work towards helping to raise funds, increase volunteer engagement, and awareness for the charities. The Foundation also organises food bank events that are aimed at reducing poverty and hunger.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 July 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valerio Simonetti | Chair | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Megan Love | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Raks Shah | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Perciballi | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS, FOOD AND SERVICES TO CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 9
Shepperton House
83-93
Shepperton Road
London
N1 3DF
- Phone:
- 02079936829
- Email:
- accounts@mr-organic.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window