THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SOUTH BEDDINGTON AND ROUNDSHAW, INCORPORATING ST MICHAEL & ALL ANGELS CHURCH SOUTH BEDDINGTON AND ST PAUL'S CHURCH ROUNDSHAW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The parish of South Beddington and Roundshaw encompasses two Anglican churches, St Michael and All Angel's, South Beddington & St Pauls, Roundshaw. We provide an open welcoming and inclusive space where people can explore and be nurtured in their faith. We offer regular Sunday and weekday services and social activities. We also host other church and community groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sutton
Governance
- 17 February 2022: Standard registration
- THE PCC OF THE PARISH OF SOUTH BEDDINGTON AND ROUNDSHAW (Working name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SOUTH BEDDINGTON AND ROUNDSHAW, INCORPORATING ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS CHURCH SOUTH BEDDINGTON AND ST PAUL'S CHURCH ROUNDSHAW (Previous name)
- THE PCC OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SOUTH BEDDINGTON & ROUNDSHAW, INCORPORATING ST MICHAEL & ALL ANGELS CHURCH SOUTH BEDDINGTON & ST PAUL'S CHURCH ROUNDSHAW (Previous name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Bernadette Excell | Chair | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Bourton | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Walker | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Marshall | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Sinka | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Newton | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennie Nash | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Bourton | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
JILLIAN EDNA FORBES | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Martin Goldsmith | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Jacqueline Dodd | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher John Chatfield | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alison Margaret Huneke | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sally Anne Page | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.43k | £161.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £132.03k | £149.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Michael's Vicarage
Milton Road
Wallington
SM6 9RP
- Phone:
- 02086471201
- Email:
- sbrvicar@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window