WEST YORKSHIRE ADHD SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are here to support anyone affected by ADHD; this includes both adults and children with or suspected of having ADHD, and also their parents/carers and siblings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £140,940 from 10 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 May 2022: CIO registration
- WEST YORKSHIRE ADHD SUPPORT GROUP CIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Holt | Chair | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sara Riley | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lewis Terry | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Dewhurst | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Holmes | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Christopher Barker | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Still | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £132.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £140.94k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF INDIVIDUALS WITH ATTENTION DEFICIT HYPERACTIVITY DISORDER (ADHD) AND ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS AND THEIR FAMILIES, CARERS, OR SUPPORTERS BY: A. INCREASING AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF ATTENTION DEFICIT HYPERACTIVITY DISORDER (ADHD) AND ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS; B. THE PROVISION OF INDOOR AND OUTDOOR ACTIVITIES, AND; C. THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND ADVOCATING FOR INDIVIDUALS (AND THEIR FAMILIES, CARERS, OR SUPPORTERS) WITH ATTENTION DEFICIT HYPERACTIVITY DISORDER (ADHD) AND ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 1
5th Floor
31/32 Park Row
Leeds
LS1 5JD
- Phone:
- 0113 8563459
- Email:
- support@wyadhd.org.uk
- Website:
-
Wyadhd.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window