CRAFT CIRCLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in arts and crafts and to promote art by building skills and interest in craft, in particular but not exclusively the arts and crafts of beading, papercraft and sewing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 June 2022: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tanya Butler | Chair | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheena Burrus | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Lee-Delisle | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Church | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Hanby | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11 | £468 | £894 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £344 | £608 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ARTS AND CRAFTS AND TO PROMOTE ART BY BUILDING SKILLS AND INTEREST IN CRAFT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE ARTS AND CRAFTS OF BEADING, PAPERCRAFT AND SEWING. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 COLESHILL PLACE
BRADWELL COMMON
MILTON KEYNES
17 Coleshill Place
Bradwell Common
MK13 8DG
- Phone:
- 07561172924
- Email:
- tanya@butlerandgrace.co
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window