THE BLACK COUNTRY MUSEUM TRANSPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING, SUPPORTING AND ASSISTING THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE BLACK COUNTRY MUSEUM IN GENERAL AND IN PARTICULAR, TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION OF TRANSPORT EXHIBITS DESTINED FOR THE SAID MUSEUM.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dudley
Governance
- 19 November 1987: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KENNETH RHODES | Chair | 17 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
ERIC BIRCH | Trustee | 25 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD HARPER | Trustee | 03 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALAN ALLCOCK | Trustee | 03 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Eric Challenor | Trustee | 17 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JAMES RHODES BSc | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM HARPER | Trustee | 16 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
DEREK REED | Trustee | 09 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.38k | £155 | £150 | £24 | £202 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.89k | £466 | £774 | £77 | £2.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 NOVEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE GROUP SHALL BE TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING, SUPPORTING AND ASSISTING THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE BLACK COUNTRY MUSEUM IN GENERAL AND IN PARTICULAR TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION OF TRANSPORT EXHIBITS DESTINED FOR THE SAID MUSEUM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 POPLAR AVENUE
WALSALL
WS5 4EU
- Phone:
- 01922646977
- Email:
- kenwrhodes04@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window