NIAMH'S NEXT STEP CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We carry out various fundraising events throughout the year including charity gala balls, golf days, football events etc. We also opened a charity shop in July 2021 in Silver Street, Wellingborough where we sell donated goods to raise money. Money raised funds vital research into neuroblastoma. Our aim is to raise awareness and funds to help children and families affected by Neuroblastoma
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 April 2022: CIO registration
- 22 November 2023: Funds received from 1150081 NIAMH'S NEXT STEP
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Curry | Chair | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Dawn Wills | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carly Ann Perry | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA STEVENS | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barry John Wills | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY FOREMAN | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £117.53k | £65.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.31k | £74.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM NEUROBLASTOMA BY RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM THE DISEASE, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE, HELPING TO FUND RESEARCH AND EDUCATION PROGRAMMES TO HELP IMPROVE THE ALL ROUND TREATMENT OF NEUROBLASTOMA AND RAISING AWARENESS OF NEUROBLASTOMA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 SILVER STREET
WELLINGBOROUGH
NN8 1BQ
- Phone:
- 01933223907
- Email:
- contact@nns.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window