Accounts and annual returns THE STANPIT VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity Number: 1199064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 08 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 May 2024 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 09 May 2024 99 days late Download Open in new window