THE STANPIT VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and upkeep of a building containing rooms and a main hall for the local community to use and hire for educational and recreational use.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 24 May 2022: CIO registration
- 28 March 2023: Funds received from 301783 THE VILLAGE HALL STANPIT
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracy Warner Charles Wright | Chair | 19 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Morris | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jane Warr | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Marr | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Martin | Trustee | 21 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Pound | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Thompson | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Baker | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Stuart Smith | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gary Patrick Weston | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Weston | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Ann Ellwood | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Anthony Lee Vassie | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mary Alexandra Ann Timms | Trustee | 20 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.56k | £29.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.34k | £25.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 99 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF STANPIT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
STANPIT VILLAGE HALL
162 STANPIT
CHRISTCHURCH
BH23 3NE
- Phone:
- 07526935311
- Email:
- STANPITVILLAGEHALL@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window