Waqforever

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity, Waqforever, headquartered in the United Kingdom, is dedicated to enhancing education, safeguarding health and well-being, and alleviating poverty globally through grants, project creation, and funding. Our mission extends to making a positive impact not only in the United Kingdom but also Europe and the rest of the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,101,902
Donations and legacies | £1.10m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£46,492
Raising funds | £862 | |
Charitable activities | £4.00k | |
Other | £41.63k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £42.49k | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.00k | |
Retained for future use | £1.06m |
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cardiff
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
Governance
- 23 August 2022: CIO registration
- WAQF RELIEF (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammad Hashim Shad | Chair | 21 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mohammad Yahya Amjad | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hamza Saleem | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ali Hammuda | Trustee | 28 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tariq Mehmood | Trustee | 21 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £1.10m | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £46.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £1.10m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £4.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £862 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £4.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £41.63k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £234.55k | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £826.26k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £5.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 March 2025 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 March 2025 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 April 2024 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 April 2024 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Aug 2022 as amended on 26 Oct 2022 as amended on 04 Jan 2023 as amended on 03 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE GRANTS AND DONATIONS, AND TO UNDERTAKE THE CREATION, FUNDING, AND OPERATION OF PROJECTS FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES; (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE; (B) THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH; (C) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP INCLUDING THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTERS IN THE FORM OF MONEY OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE; (D) ANY OTHER PURPOSES WHICH MAY BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 CEFN COED ROAD
CARDIFF
CF23 6AQ
- Phone:
- +44 7440 592444
- Email:
- info@waqforever.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window