CANNOCK CHASE SHED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cannock Chase Shed provides workshop facilities whereby men and women can meet to engage in practical projects of an individual or local community nature. These facilities and activities are also conducive to developing social interactions and increased mental well-being which can help to alleviate feelings of social isolation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 04 April 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY ERIC RAYMOND CRADDOCK | Chair | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Graham Stanley Johnson | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter Patrick Ross | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
David James Shaw | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Jewkes | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barry Kenneth James | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.40k | £27.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.99k | £8.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE AGED 18 AND OVER, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OLDER MEN, WITHIN CANNOCK CHASE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN WHICH THEY CAN MEET JOINTLY OR INDIVIDUALLY TO LEARN OR SHARE SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE, AND SUPPORT EACH OTHER TO UNDERTAKE INDIVIDUAL, GROUP OR LOCAL COMMUNITY ACTIVITIES OF A PRACTICAL, CREATIVE, OR SOCIAL NATURE. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; OLD AGE; LONELINESS; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 3.07
Cannock Chase Enterprise Centre
Walkers Rise
Rugeley Road
Hednesford
WS12 0QU
- Phone:
- 07964851114
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window