ASHTON UNDER LYNE CHRISTADELPHIAN CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian faith for the benefit of the public in accordance with the Statement of the Doctrines forming the Christadelphian Basis of Fellowship in particular but not exclusively through the holding of prayer meetings, worship, lectures and producing and/or distributing literature on Christadelphia to enlighten others about the Christian faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 May 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Morgan | Chair | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Tonge | Trustee | 02 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Cook | Trustee | 19 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Cook | Trustee | 18 March 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.86k | £25.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.56k | £20.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 May 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF THE DOCTRINES FORMING THE CHRISTADELPHIAN BASIS OF FELLOWSHIP IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, WORSHIP, LECTURES AND PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON CHRISTADELPHIA TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ashton Christadelphian Church
CURRIER LANE
ASHTON-UNDER-LYNE
OL6 6TB
- Phone:
- 07878559558
- Email:
- ashtonchurch@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window