THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW'S AND ST PETER'S, SOUTH SHOEBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are two Church of England churches in Shoebury, Essex. We have services in both churches every Sunday and at other times including baptisms, weddings and funerals. We support our local community and provide charitable donations to local and other organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 23 February 2022: Standard registration
- PARISH OF ST ANDREW'S AND ST PETER'S, SOUTH SHOEBURY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev LOUISE MARGARET WILLIAMS | Chair | 24 November 2010 |
|
|
||||
Debra Susan Slack | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Harrison Thomas | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Max Gary Barnes | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Phipps | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Denise Askew | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Gerrard Dromgoole | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey George Price | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Rebecca Hansford | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Elizabeth Baines | Trustee | 30 April 1998 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Clipsham | Trustee | 15 April 1995 |
|
|
||||
Keith Thomas Barham | Trustee | 30 April 1993 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £330.65k | £125.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £144.21k | £158.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 Church Road
Shoeburyness
SOUTHEND-ON-SEA
SS3 9EU
- Phone:
- 01702292778
- Email:
- revlwilliams@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window