HIGH LEVEL (NORTHERN) TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of sickness and the rehabilitation of those suffering from any kind of addiction or stress related illness through holistic therapeutic treatments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £48,470 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Rochdale
Governance
- 29 March 2022: CIO registration
- 02 May 2023: Funds received from 1106699 HIGH LEVEL (NORTHERN) TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN DUCKWORTH | Chair | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Page | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Young | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
NASIM ASHRAF | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|||||
David Chorlton | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Bromley | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
RUSSELL MORLEY | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £251.70k | £281.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £238.97k | £242.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £46.90k | £48.47k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND REHABILITATION OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM ANY KIND OF ADDICTION OR STRESS RELATED ILLNESS THROUGH HOLISTIC THERAPEUTIC TREATMENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HIGH LEVEL (NORTHERN) TRUST
CHAMPNESS HALL
DRAKE STREET
ROCHDALE
OL16 1PB
- Phone:
- 01706860247
- Email:
- highlevel@hlnt.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window