SINGERSRESOUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of SingersResound is to preserve and protect the physical and mental health of opera and classical singers when they have encountered difficulties which impact their ability to perform. The charity fulfils this objective by providing a mentoring programme offering confidential support and education to help rebuild confidence and skills and to help alleviate isolation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 April 2022: CIO registration
- RESOUND (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Spence KC | Trustee | 30 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Dr Anny Pritchard | Trustee | 30 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Neal Cooper | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Kitchen Ms | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Winter | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.94k | £1.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.34k | £9.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF SINGERSRESOUND ARE TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF OPERA AND CLASSICAL SINGERS WHEN THEY HAVE ENCOUNTERED DIFFICULTIES WHICH IMPACT ON THEIR ABILITY TO PERFORM BY PROVIDING MENTORS TO PROVIDE CONFIDENTIAL SUPPORT AND EDUCATION TO HELP REBUILD THEIR CONFIDENCE AND SKILLS AND TO HELP ALLEVIATE ISOLATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Harrabeer Country House Hotel
Harrowbeer Lane
YELVERTON
Devon
PL20 6EA
- Phone:
- 07394311003
- Email:
- singersresound@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window