REFUGEES WELCOME NORTH SOMERSET

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Collecting and distributing aid and essential items for asylum seekers, refugees and vulnerable migrants arriving in North Somerset. Welcome Centre for education, social activities and access to free shop Pop up 'welcome cafe' sessions where people can socialise, access support and practice their English. A member led lunch provision. Befriending to support with appointments and integration
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £73,717 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Somerset
Governance
- 22 March 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Bowie | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Bowen | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof David Punter | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Reynolds | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mir Rohullah Sadat | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.72k | £102.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.53k | £102.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £19.24k | £73.72k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND DISTRESS AMONGST REFUGEES, ASYLUM-SEEKERS AND VULNERABLE MIGRANTS RESETTLED IN NORTH SOMERSET, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: THE PROVISION AND COORDINATION OF A COUNTY-WIDE NETWORK OF TRAINED VOLUNTEER BEFRIENDERS; THE PROVISION OF HOUSEHOLD GOODS AND PREPARATION OF HOUSING FOR FAMILIES; THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT FOR INTEGRATION INTO THE LOCAL COMMUNITY; THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, ADVOCACY AND PRACTICAL ASSISTANCE IN ACCESSING STATUTORY PUBLIC SERVICES, HEALTH AND WELL-BEING SERVICES, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES; THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND DECISION-MAKERS ON POLICIES THAT AFFECT RESETTLED PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O RENS The Other Place
81-83 Meadow Street
Weston Super Mare
BS23 1QL
- Phone:
- 07955278016
- Email:
- trustees@rwns.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window