HORNIMANS ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community play and youth provision delivering enriching activities that improve wellbeing of disadvantaged children and young people aged 5 to 16. Operates from purpose built premises in the Golborne ward of North Kensington, Kensington and Chelsea, London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £87,140 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 22 March 2022: CIO registration
- 10 June 2022: Funds received from 802220 HORNIMANS ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracy Wauchope | Chair | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol London-Baptiste | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alex Hood | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WERNER-RATKOVIC MR | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH FIAMBERTI | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £182.03k | £192.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £175.33k | £189.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £103.17k | £87.14k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION, EDUCATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR CHILDREN RESIDENT IN GOLDBORNE WARD AND SURROUNDING AREAS IN KENSINGTON AND CHELSEA, BEING FACILITIES: (A) OF WHICH SUCH CHILDREN HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, AND (B) WHICH WILL IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH CHILDREN BY PROMOTING THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BIG GREEN GATES
32 SOUTHERN ROW
LONDON
W10 5AN
- Phone:
- 02089695740
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window